Senate | 03/28/2024 | Reported Do Pass Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Williams | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | CR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Boles |