Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3547 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 6, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 25, 2024

Amended

Bill April 1, 2024
Bill February 16, 2024