Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3556 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 29, 2024

Amended

Bill April 15, 2024
Bill March 3, 2024