Senate | 03/28/2024 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 5 | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Kendrix |