Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Ranson, Roberts, Munson, Deck
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Authored by Senator Stephens (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Miller, Talley, Menz, Schreiber, Kendrix, McCall, Alonso-Sandoval, Provenzano, May
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Pae
|
|
|