House
|
05/06/2024
|
Becomes law without Governor's signature 05/05/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Authored by Senator Prieto (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Pae
|
|
|