House
|
04/23/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/23/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Pittman
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Hill
|
|
|