Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 20 | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Referred to Judiciary - Criminal | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Remove Representative Hill as principal House author and substitute with Representative Ford | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Hill |