Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Hill |