Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3623 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2024

Amended

Bill April 15, 2024
Bill March 4, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill March 4, 2024