House
|
05/30/2024
|
Becomes law without Governor's signature 05/30/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 33 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Remove Senator Stephens as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Kidd
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Conference granted, SCs named Stephens, Newhouse, Pemberton, Rader, Kidd, Haste, Dossett
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
HC's named: Conference Committee on Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Remove as author Senator Coleman; authored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Remove Representative Kannady as principal House author and substitute with Representative Culver
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Kannady
|
|
|