Senate | 05/09/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Wolfley | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 17 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Title stricken | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative ODonnell |