House
|
04/23/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/22/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Goodwin
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 8
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Tammy)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Authored by Senator Matthews (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Lowe (Jason)
|
|
|