Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3756 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 15, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 17, 2024

Amended

Bill April 2, 2024
Bill February 12, 2024