House
|
04/18/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/18/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Duel
|
|
|