Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3792 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 6, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2024

Amended

Bill April 22, 2024
Bill March 1, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 26, 2024