Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3854 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 11, 2024

Amended

Bill April 22, 2024
Bill March 3, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill May 28, 2024
Bill April 18, 2024
Bill February 29, 2024