House
|
04/29/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/26/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Wildlife Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred to Wildlife
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Cornwell
|
|
|