House | 02/29/2024 | Title stricken | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Authored by Senator Gollihare (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Ford | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | First Reading |