Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sneed, Sterling | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Insurance | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Ford |