House | 02/26/2024 | Referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Ford | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | First Reading |