Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Finance Committee | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Burns | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Title stricken | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Authored by Senator Seifried (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Menz, Boles | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) |