Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Authored by Senator Green (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Deck |