House
|
04/23/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/22/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hardin
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Echols
|
|
|