House
|
05/22/2024
|
HC's named: GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Conference granted, SCs named Hall, Rader, Howard, Daniels, Stanley, Kirt
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Finance
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Echols
|
|
|