House | 02/28/2024 | Emergency added | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Echols | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Withdrawn from Public Health Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Remove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative McEntire | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Referred to Public Health | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Echols | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | First Reading |