Senate | 04/09/2024 | Failed in Committee - Education | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Finance Committee | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 32 | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Echols |