Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3998 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 17, 2024

Amended

Bill April 1, 2024
Bill February 22, 2024