House
|
04/23/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/22/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Munson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Finance
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Dollens
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Authored by Senator Seifried (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Menz
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative McBride
|
|
|