House
|
05/29/2024
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Ford
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
HC's named: GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Conference granted, SCs named Alvord, Rader, Howard, Daniels, Rosino, Kirt
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 13
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 38 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Alvord
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Measure failed: Ayes: 17 Nays: 26
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 25; Ayes: 62 Nays: 25
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Townley
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Authored by Senator Alvord (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative McBride
|
|
|