Senate | 04/04/2024 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Wallace |