Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 3 | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Authored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Rick) | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Title stricken | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Caldwell (Trey) |