Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 29 | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Utilities Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Referred to Utilities | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Caldwell (Trey) |