Senate | 04/11/2024 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Authored by Senator Gollihare (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle, West (Josh), McBride | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Trey) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Referred to Public Health | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Remove Representative Caldwell (Trey) as principal House author and substitute with Representative Kendrix | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Caldwell (Trey) |