Senate | 05/01/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Pittman | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | HAs read | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Remove Representative Pfeiffer as principal House author and substitute with Representative Blancett | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | CR; Do Pass Agriculture Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Kidd |