Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1035 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 27, 2023