House | 04/11/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cantrell | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Worthen (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Kidd |