House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Bashore (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Rosino |