Senate | 02/22/2023 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Green | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading |