House | 03/29/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Conley (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Dahm |