Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1144 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/20/2023

                             
 
 
Req. No. 1760 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) 
 
SENATE BILL 1144 	By: Thompson (Roger) and Hall 
of the Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Wallace and Martinez of the 
House 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to appropriations; making an 
appropriation to the Oklahoma State University 
Medical Authority; stating purpose; providing lapse 
dates; requiring and prohibiting certain budget 
procedures; and declaring an emergency. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.  There is hereby appropriated to the Oklahoma State 
University Medical Authority from any monies not otherwise 
appropriated from the General Revenue Fund of the State Treasury for 
the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024, th e sum of One Hundred 
Thousand Dollars ($100,000.00 ) or so much thereof as may be 
necessary to perform the duties imposed upon the Oklahoma State 
University Medical Authority by law. 
SECTION 2.  Appropriations made by this act, not including 
appropriations made for capital outlay purposes, may be budget ed for   
 
 
Req. No. 1760 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024 (hereafter FY -24), or may be 
budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025 (hereafter FY -25).  
Funds budgeted for FY -24 may be encumbered only through June 30 , 
2024, and must be expended by November 15, 2024.  Any funds 
remaining after November 15, 2024, and not budgeted for FY -25, shall 
lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal 
year.  Funds budgeted for FY-25 may be encumbered only thr ough June 
30, 2025.  Any funds remaining after Nov ember 15, 2025, shall lapse 
to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year.  
These appropriations may not be budgeted in both fiscal years 
simultaneously.  Funds budgeted in FY -24 and not required to pay 
obligations for that fiscal year, may be budgeted for FY -25, after 
the agency to which the funds have been appropriated has prepared 
and submitted a budget work program revision removing these funds 
from the FY-24 budget work program and a fter such revision has been 
approved by the Office of Management and Enterprise Services. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emerg ency is hereby 
declared to exist, by re ason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
 
59-1-1760 WR 2/20/2023 11:16:42 AM