Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1211 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 16, 2024

Amended

Bill April 4, 2024
Bill February 14, 2024