Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1231 Introduced / Bill

Filed 12/07/2023

                     
 
Req. No. 2306 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 59th Legislature (2024) 
 
SENATE BILL 1231 	By: Bergstrom 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to professions and occupat ions; 
amending 59 O.S. 2021, Section 137, which relates to 
the Board of Podiatric M edical Examiners; extending 
sunset date; updating statutory refer ence; providing 
an effective date; and declaring an emergency . 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     5 9 O.S. 2021, Section 137, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 137. A.  A Board of Podiatric Med ical Examiners is 
hereby re-created, to continue until July 1, 2024 July 1, 2027, in 
accordance with the provisions of t he Oklahoma Sunset Law .  Said The 
Board shall regulate the practice of podiatric medicine in this 
state in accordance with th e provisions of the Podiatric Medicine 
Practice Act.  The Board, appointed by the Governor, shall be 
composed of five podiatric physici ans licensed to practice podiatric 
medicine in this state and one lay member representing the public. 
B.  Each podiatric physician member of the Board shall: 
1.  Be a legal resident of this state;   
 
Req. No. 2306 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
2.  Have practiced podiatric medicine continuously in this state 
during the three (3) years immediately preceding appointment to the 
Board; 
3.  Be free of pending disciplinary action or active 
investigation by the Board; and 
4.  Be a member in good standing of the American Podiatric 
Medical Association and of the Oklahoma Podiatric Medic al 
Association. 
C.  The lay member of the Board shall: 
1.  Be a legal resident of this sta te; 
2.  Not be a registered or licensed practitioner of any of the 
healing arts or be related, within the third degree of consanguinity 
or affinity, to any such perso n; and 
3.  Participate in Board proceedings only for the purposes of: 
a. reviewing, investigating and disposing of written 
complaints regarding the conduct of podiatric 
physicians, and 
b. formulating, adopting and promulgating rules pursuant 
to Article I of the Administrative Procedures Act. 
D.  Except as provided in subsection E of this s ection, the term 
of office of each podiatric physician member of the Board shall be 
five (5) years, with one such member being appointed to the Boa rd 
each year.  The lay member of the Board shall serve a term 
coterminous with that of the Governor .  Each member shall hold   
 
Req. No. 2306 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
office until the expiration of the term for which appointed or until 
a qualified successor has been duly appointed .  An appointment shall 
be made by the Governor within ninety (90) days after the expiration 
of the term of any member, or the occurrence of a vacanc y on the 
Board due to resignation, death, or any other cause resulting in an 
unexpired term.  The appointment of the podiatr ic physician members 
shall be made from a list of not less than five persons submitted 
annually to the Govern or by the Oklahoma Podiatric Medical 
Association. 
E.  Each of the three podiatric physician members of the Board, 
serving on the effective date of this act September 1,1993, shall 
complete the term of office for which he or she was appointed, and 
the successor to each suc h member shall be appointed for a term of 
five (5) years.  Within sixty (60) days after the effective date of 
this act September 1, 1993, the Governor shall appoint t wo new 
podiatric physician members to the Board, one for a term expiring 
July 1, 1997, and one for a term ex piring on July 1, 1998 .  The 
successor to each such new member shall be appointed for a term of 
five (5) years. 
F.  Before assuming duties on the Board, each member shall take 
and subscribe to the oath or affirmation provided in Article XV of 
the Oklahoma Constitution, which oath or affirmation shall be 
administered and filed as provided in said such article.   
 
Req. No. 2306 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
G.  A member may be removed from the Board by t he Governor for 
cause which shall include, but not be limited to: 
1.  Ceasing to be qualified; 
2.  Being found guilty by a court of competent jurisdiction of a 
felony or of any offense involving moral turpitude; 
3.  Being found guilty, through due process, of malfeasance, 
misfeasance or nonfeasance in relation t o Board duties; 
4.  Being found mentally incompetent by a court of competent 
jurisdiction; 
5.  Being found in violation of any provision of the Podiatric 
Medicine Practice Act; or 
6.  Failing to attend three consecutive meetings of the Board 
without just cause, as determined by the Board. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2024. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emerge ncy is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
 
59-2-2306 RD 12/7/2023 9:24:51 AM