Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1231 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
22
3+SB1231 HFLR Page 1
4+BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1
5+2
6+3
7+4
8+5
9+6
10+7
11+8
12+9
13+10
14+11
15+12
16+13
17+14
18+15
19+16
20+17
21+18
22+19
23+20
24+21
25+22
26+23
27+24
328
4-An Act
5-ENROLLED SENATE
29+HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION
30+
31+STATE OF OKLAHOMA
32+
33+2nd Session of the 59th Legislature (2024)
34+
35+ENGROSSED SENATE
636 BILL NO. 1231 By: Bergstrom of the Senate
737
838 and
939
1040 Kendrix of the House
41+
1142
1243
1344
1445 An Act relating to professions and occupations;
1546 amending 59 O.S. 2021, Section 137, which relates to
1647 the Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners; extending
1748 sunset date; updating statutory reference; providing
1849 an effective date; and declaring an emergency .
1950
2051
2152
22-SUBJECT: Extending sunset date
53+
2354
2455 BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA:
25-
2656 SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 59 O.S. 2021, Section 137, is
2757 amended to read as follows:
28-
2958 Section 137. A. A Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners is
3059 hereby re-created, to continue until July 1, 2024 July 1, 2027, in
3160 accordance with the pro visions of the Oklahoma Sunset Law. Said The
3261 Board shall regulate the practice of podiatric medicine in this
3362 state in accordance with the provisions of the Podiatric Medicine
3463 Practice Act. The B oard, appointed by the Governor, shall be
3564 composed of five podiatric physicians licensed to practice podiatric
3665 medicine in this state and one lay member representing the public.
3766
67+SB1231 HFLR Page 2
68+BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1
69+2
70+3
71+4
72+5
73+6
74+7
75+8
76+9
77+10
78+11
79+12
80+13
81+14
82+15
83+16
84+17
85+18
86+19
87+20
88+21
89+22
90+23
91+24
92+
3893 B. Each podiatric physician member of the Board shall:
39-
4094 1. Be a legal resident of this state;
41-
4295 2. Have practiced podiatric medicine conti nuously in this state
4396 during the three (3) years immediately preceding appointment to the
4497 Board;
45-
46-
47-ENR. S. B. NO. 1231 Page 2
4898 3. Be free of pending disciplinary action or active
4999 investigation by the Board; and
50-
51100 4. Be a member in good standing of the American Podiatric
52101 Medical Association and of the Oklahoma Podiatric Medical
53102 Association.
54-
55103 C. The lay member of the Board shall:
56-
57104 1. Be a legal resident of this state;
58-
59105 2. Not be a registered or licensed practitioner of any of the
60106 healing arts or be related, within the third degree of cons anguinity
61107 or affinity, to any such person; and
62-
63108 3. Participate in Board proceedings only for the purposes of:
64-
65109 a. reviewing, investigating and disposing of written
66110 complaints regarding the conduct of podiatric
67111 physicians, and
68-
69112 b. formulating, adopting and pr omulgating rules pursuant
70113 to Article I of the Administrative Procedures Act.
71-
72114 D. Except as provided in su bsection E of this section, the term
73115 of office of each podiatric physician member of the Board shall be
74116 five (5) years, with one such member being appo inted to the Board
117+
118+SB1231 HFLR Page 3
119+BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1
120+2
121+3
122+4
123+5
124+6
125+7
126+8
127+9
128+10
129+11
130+12
131+13
132+14
133+15
134+16
135+17
136+18
137+19
138+20
139+21
140+22
141+23
142+24
143+
75144 each year. The lay member of the Board shall serve a term
76145 coterminous with that of th e Governor. Each member shall hold
77146 office until the expiration of the term for which appoi nted or until
78147 a qualified successor has been duly appointed. An appointment shall
79148 be made by the Governor within ninety (90) days after the expiration
80149 of the term of any member, or the occurrence of a vacancy on the
81150 Board due to resignation, death, or any other cause resulting in an
82151 unexpired term. The appointmen t of the podiatric physician members
83152 shall be made from a list of not less than five persons submitted
84153 annually to the Governor by the Oklahoma Podiatric Medical
85154 Association.
86-
87155 E. Each of the three podiatric physician members of the Board,
88156 serving on the effective date of this act September 1,1993, shall
89157 complete the term of office for which he or she was appo inted, and
90-
91-ENR. S. B. NO. 1231 Page 3
92158 the successor to each such member shall be appointed for a term of
93159 five (5) years. Within sixty (60) days after the effective date of
94160 this act September 1, 1993, the Governor shall appoint two new
95161 podiatric physician members to the Board, one f or a term expiring
96162 July 1, 1997, and one for a term expiring on July 1, 1998. The
97163 successor to each such new member shall be appointed for a term of
98164 five (5) years.
99-
100165 F. Before assuming duties on the Board, each member shall take
101166 and subscribe to the oath or affirmation provided in Article XV of
167+
168+SB1231 HFLR Page 4
169+BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1
170+2
171+3
172+4
173+5
174+6
175+7
176+8
177+9
178+10
179+11
180+12
181+13
182+14
183+15
184+16
185+17
186+18
187+19
188+20
189+21
190+22
191+23
192+24
193+
102194 the Oklahoma Constitution, which oath or affirmation shall be
103195 administered and filed as provided in said such article.
104-
105196 G. A member may be removed from the Board by the Governor for
106197 cause which shall include, but no t be limited to:
107-
108198 1. Ceasing to be qualified;
109-
110199 2. Being found guilty by a court of competen t jurisdiction of a
111200 felony or of any offense involving moral turpitude;
112-
113201 3. Being found guilty, through due process, of malfeasance,
114202 misfeasance or nonfeasance in re lation to Board duties;
115-
116203 4. Being found mentally incompetent by a court of competent
117204 jurisdiction;
118-
119205 5. Being found in violation of any provision of the Podiatric
120206 Medicine Practice Act; or
121-
122207 6. Failing to attend three consecutive meetings of the Board
123208 without just cause, as determined by the Board.
124-
125209 SECTION 2. This act shall become effective July 1, 2024.
126-
127210 SECTION 3. It being immediately necessary for the preservation
128211 of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereb y
129212 declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and
130213 be in full force from and after its passage and approval.
131214
132-
133-ENR. S. B. NO. 1231 Page 4
134-Passed the Senate the 14th day of March, 2024.
135-
136-
137-
138- Presiding Officer of the Senate
139-
140-
141-Passed the House of Representatives the 15th day of April, 2024.
142-
143-
144-
145- Presiding Officer of the House
146- of Representatives
147-
148-OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR
149-Received by the Office of the Governor this _______ _____________
150-day of _________________ __, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M.
151-By: _________________________________
152-Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma this _______ __
153-day of _________________ __, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M.
154-
155- _________________________________
156- Governor of the State of Oklahoma
157-
158-
159-OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE
160-Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this _______ ___
161-day of _________________ _, 20 _______, at _______ o'clock _______ M.
162-By: _________________________________
215+COMMITTEE REPORT BY: C OMMITTEE ON ADMINISTRATIVE RULES, dated
216+03/28/2024 - DO PASS.