Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1294 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 29, 2024

Amended

Bill April 18, 2024
Bill February 14, 2024