House | 04/17/2023 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Woods | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 10 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Burns | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Finance Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Bullard |