Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/23/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Swope
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Munson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Rosino
|
|
|