Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1384 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 15, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 6, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 16, 2024

Amended

Bill April 4, 2024
Bill February 8, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 7, 2024