House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Miller (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Floyd |