Senate
|
06/14/2024
|
Approved by Governor 06/14/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
SCs named Hall, Haste, Alvord, Green, Woods, Kirt
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Staires
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Bullard, Burns
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Miller, Cantrell
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Kidd
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Green
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Hall
|
|
|